Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Daniel Fernández

Bishop of Jujuy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1954 BornBuenos Aires
14 Nov 198026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Sep 200752.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraná, Argentina
20 Sep 200752.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Caltadria
30 Nov 200753.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caltadria
25 Aug 201156.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jujuy, Argentina
7 Jun 201257.6AppointedBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
6 Aug 201257.8InstalledBishop of Jujuy, Argentina

MicroData Summary for César Daniel Fernández:
Bishop César Daniel Fernández (born ) Bishop of Jujuy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jujuy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,566
  • ab: CB, 25 Aug 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2012
  • i: CB, 5 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014