Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Chaparro Stivanello, C.M.F.

Bishop of San Carlos de Bariloche, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1953 Born
1 Mar 197521.6ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
12 Feb 197925.5Perpetual VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
6 Oct 197926.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
12 Apr 198026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
9 Jul 201359.9AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Bariloche, Argentina
28 Sep 201360.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Bariloche, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan José Chaparro Stivanello
Bishop Juan José Chaparro Stivanello C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of San Carlos de Bariloche

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColonia Freitas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Carlos de Bariloche.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 14 Aug 2013
  • c2+: CB, 4 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,884

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast