Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulino Reale Chirina

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Venado Tuerto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1924BornCanicattini Bagni
5 Dec 194824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mendoza, Argentina
19 Jun 198965.4AppointedBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
8 Sep 198965.6Ordained BishopBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
17 Sep 198965.6InstalledBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
16 Dec 200076.9RetiredBishop of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
29 Mar 201288.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Venado Tuerto, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Paulino Reale Chirina:
Bishop Paulino Reale Chirina (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Venado Tuerto

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,774
  • d: CB, 29 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014