Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elmer Osmar Ramón Miani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Catamarca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1933Born
20 Sep 195825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
7 Nov 198350.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
7 Nov 198350.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
12 Dec 198350.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caeciri
19 Dec 198956.6AppointedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
3 Mar 199056.8InstalledBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
27 Dec 200774.6ResignedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
25 May 201481.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Catamarca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Elmer Osmar Ramón Miani
Bishop Elmer Osmar Ramón Miani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Catamarca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Concepción del Tío

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 25 May 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018