Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Arturo Roldán

Deceased

Bishop of San Rafael, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1931Born
5 Dec 195423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
26 May 198049.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
26 May 198049.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala
15 Aug 198049.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala
9 Nov 199160.4AppointedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
19 Dec 199160.5InstalledBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
31 May 199665.0DiedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jesús Arturo Roldán
Bishop Jesús Arturo Roldán (born , died ) Bishop of San Rafael

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlta Gracia

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast