Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro María Olmedo Rivero, C.M.F.

Prelate of Humahuaca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1944 Born
9 Jun 197227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
7 Jul 199348.7AppointedPrelate of Humahuaca, Argentina
25 Sep 199348.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Humahuaca, Argentina
26 Nov 199349.0InstalledPrelate of Humahuaca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pedro María Olmedo Rivero
Bishop Pedro María Olmedo Rivero C.M.F. (born ) Prelate of Humahuaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan de Asnalfarache, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Humahuaca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,174
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018