Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Octavio Nicolás Derisi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of La Plata

Titular Archbishop of Rhasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1907BornPergamino
20 Dec 193023.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 197063.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
16 Nov 197063.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhasus
19 Dec 197063.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhasus
24 May 198477.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
24 May 198477.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhasus
22 Oct 200295.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of La Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Octavio Nicolás Derisi:
Archbishop Octavio Nicolás Derisi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of La Plata

  • a priest for 71.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013