Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Montes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chascomús


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1920BornAlmirante Brown
20 Dec 195838.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata, Argentina
15 Jun 197858.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
15 Jun 197858.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
15 Aug 197858.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia
19 Jan 198362.8AppointedBishop of Chascomús, Argentina
8 Mar 198363.0InstalledBishop of Chascomús, Argentina
3 Jul 199676.3RetiredBishop of Chascomús, Argentina
2 Sep 201191.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Chascomús, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José María Montes:
Bishop José María Montes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chascomús

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 2 Sep 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013