Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Gerstner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concordia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1921BornDiamante
21 Apr 194725.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 197755.2AppointedBishop of Concordia, Argentina
26 Mar 197755.4Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia, Argentina
2 May 199876.5RetiredBishop of Concordia, Argentina
4 Dec 200281.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Concordia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Gerstner:
Bishop Adolfo Gerstner (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concordia

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013