Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Ramón Chalup

Deceased

Bishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1911Born
21 Dec 193524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Corrientes, Argentina
13 Mar 195745.9AppointedBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
9 Jun 195746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
29 Jun 195746.2InstalledBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
11 Jul 196655.3DiedBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Ramón Chalup
Bishop Jorge Ramón Chalup (born , died ) Bishop of Gualeguaychú

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaso de los Libres

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018