Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Oscar Faifer

Bishop Emeritus of Goya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1940 BornUrdinarrain
15 Aug 196423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
10 Oct 200262.0AppointedBishop of Goya, Argentina
12 Dec 200262.2Ordained BishopBishop of Goya, Argentina
24 Sep 201575.0RetiredBishop of Goya, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Oscar Faifer:
Bishop Ricardo Oscar Faifer (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Goya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,289
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015