Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Víctor Manuel López Forero

Archbishop Emeritus of Bucaramanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1931 BornPuente Nacional
27 Oct 195726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
6 May 197746.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
6 May 197746.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Afufenia
29 Jun 197746.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Afufenia
6 Dec 198049.6AppointedBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
7 Jun 198554.1AppointedBishop of Colombia, Military
7 Jun 198554.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cilibia
21 Jun 199463.2AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
27 Jun 199867.2AppointedArchbishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
13 Feb 200977.8RetiredArchbishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Víctor Manuel López Forero:
Archbishop Víctor Manuel López Forero (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bucaramanga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bucaramanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015