Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos José Boaventura Kloppenburg, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1919BornMolbergen, Germany
6 Jan 194626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 May 198262.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
22 May 198262.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
1 Aug 198262.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
8 Aug 198666.8AppointedBishop of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
22 Nov 199576.1RetiredBishop of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 May 200989.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Novo Hamburgo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos José Boaventura Kloppenburg:
Bishop Carlos José Boaventura Kloppenburg O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Novo Hamburgo

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013