Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camilo Fernando Castrellón Pizano, S.D.B.

Bishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1942 Born
2 Dec 197230.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Apr 200158.5AppointedBishop of Tibú, Colombia
6 Jun 200158.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tibú, Colombia
2 Dec 200967.1AppointedBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
6 Mar 201067.4InstalledBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Camilo Fernando Castrellón Pizano
Bishop Camilo Fernando Castrellón Pizano S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Barrancabermeja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantafé de Bogotá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barrancabermeja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,987

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 May 2017