Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Casanare

Apostolicus Vicariatus Casanarensis

Suppressed

To: Diocese of Yopal



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
17 July 1893ErectedDiocese of Tunja Vicariate Apostolic of Casanare (erected)
26 May 1915Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Casanare Prefecture Apostolic of Arauca (erected)
29 October 1999Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Casanare Vicariate Apostolic of Trinidad (erected)
29 October 1999SuppressedVicariate Apostolic of Casanare (suppressed) Diocese of Yopal (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195038,52042,00091.7%10103,85210185ap1951
196671,00072,19198.4%17174,1764712ap1967
197092,50093,00099.5%19194,868196018ap1971
1976105,000120,00087.5%612185,833176115ap1977
198098,600113,50086.9%710175,800156616ap1981
1990141,142165,33085.4%157226,415126719ap1991

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013