Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santos Ballesteros y López, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Casanare

Titular Bishop of Capharnaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1869BornBernedo, Spain
13 Dec 188516.1ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
11 Jun 189222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
22 Apr 192050.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia
22 Apr 192050.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
15 May 192151.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
13 Nov 193364.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia
3 Jul 194777.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Casanare, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Santos Ballesteros y López:
Bishop Santos Ballesteros y López O.A.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Casanare

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013