Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atanasio María Vicente Soler y Royo, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Goajira, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Citharizum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1870Born
21 May 190232.3ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
31 Dec 190636.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Goajira, Colombia
31 Dec 190636.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Citharizum
19 May 190737.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citharizum
21 Nov 193060.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Goajira, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Atanasio María Vicente Soler y Royo
Bishop Atanasio María Vicente Soler y Royo O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Goajira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManises, Spain

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 22
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018