Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Simón y Ródenas, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Marta

Titular Bishop of Echinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1849BornOrihuela, Spain
1875¹25.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Jul 190454.8AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
30 Oct 190455.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
2 Dec 191263.2ResignedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
2 Dec 191263.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
22 Aug 191464.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Marta, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Simón y Ródenas:
Bishop Francisco Simón y Ródenas O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Marta

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013