Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Adán (Pietro-Adamo) Brioschi, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cartagena, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1860Born
23 Sep 188222.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 188222.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 189837.8AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
8 May 189838.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
17 Jul 190141.2AppointedArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia
13 Nov 194383.5DiedArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Pedro Adán (Pietro-Adamo) Brioschi (VIAF: 19221084)
Archbishop Pedro Adán (Pietro-Adamo) Brioschi P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cartagena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTradate, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017