Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Junguito, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1841BornBogotá, Colombia
10 Jan 187533.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Apr 190159.4AppointedBishop of Panamá
14 Jul 190159.6Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
21 Oct 191169.9DiedBishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Junguito:
Bishop Francisco Javier Junguito S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Panamá

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 437
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013