Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Alegría Iriarte, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Casanare

Titular Bishop of Zorolus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1876BornQuintana, Spain
17 Nov 189216.3ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
1899²22.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
9 Jul 193458.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia
9 Jul 193458.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zorolus
4 Nov 193458.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zorolus
11 Sep 193963.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Alegría Iriarte:
Bishop Pablo Alegría Iriarte O.A.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Casanare

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015