Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olavio López Duque, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Casanare

Titular Bishop of Strongoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1932BornManizales
28 Sep 194715.6ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
30 Oct 195523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
30 May 197745.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia
30 May 197745.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Strongoli
7 Aug 197745.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Strongoli
29 Oct 199967.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia
11 Jun 201381.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Casanare, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Olavio López Duque:
Bishop Olavio López Duque O.A.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Casanare

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013