Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Javier Pizarro Acevedo, O.A.R.

Vicar Apostolic of Trinidad

Titular Bishop of Ceramus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1951 BornMedellin
8 Jan 197725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
23 Oct 200049.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Colombia
23 Oct 200049.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
27 Jan 200150.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus

MicroData Summary for Héctor Javier Pizarro Acevedo:
Bishop Héctor Javier Pizarro Acevedo O.A.R. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Trinidad

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Trinidad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,891

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015