Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rubén Buitrago Trujillo, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zipaquirá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1921BornManizales
14 May 194422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
25 Feb 197149.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
25 Feb 197149.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
25 Mar 197149.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
8 Jul 197452.8AppointedBishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia
27 Sep 199170.0DiedBishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rubén Buitrago Trujillo:
Bishop Rubén Buitrago Trujillo O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Zipaquirá

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013