Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Rueda Rueda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antioquía, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1823Born
12 Feb 185026.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 187754.3AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
12 Sep 187855.2ResignedBishop-Elect of Cartagena, Colombia
3 Jul 188259.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tunja, Colombia
3 Jul 188259.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
15 Oct 188259.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
30 Jan 189268.6AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
1900¹76.6ResignedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
30 Jul 190380.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Antioquía, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Nepomuceno Rueda Rueda
Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Rueda Rueda (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antioquía

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZapatoca

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 110, and Page 186
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 507
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017