Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Jaramillo Duque, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sincelejo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1924BornManizales
23 Sep 195026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Sep 197349.4AppointedPrefect of Ariari, Colombia
3 Aug 198157.3AppointedBishop of Sincelejo, Colombia
20 Sep 198157.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sincelejo, Colombia
16 Sep 199066.4DiedBishop of Sincelejo, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Héctor Jaramillo Duque:
Bishop Héctor Jaramillo Duque S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Sincelejo

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013