Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Sismondo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pontremoli, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1879Born
16 Jul 190525.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 193050.3AppointedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
9 Mar 193050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
30 Sep 195475.0RetiredBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
30 Sep 195475.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
21 Feb 195575.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
7 Dec 195778.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Pontremoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Sismondo (VIAF: 19245272)
Archbishop Giovanni Sismondo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pontremoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrusasco

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018