Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Mazzini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anagni

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1872BornCogorno
8 Jun 189523.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 192351.8AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
27 Jan 192452.1Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
15 Jun 192452.4InstalledBishop of Anagni, Italy
24 Jun 192654.5ResignedBishop of Anagni, Italy
24 Jun 192654.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
24 Jun 192654.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
1928²56.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
13 Dec 195078.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Anagni, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Mazzini:
Bishop Luigi Mazzini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Anagni

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013