Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Maria de Amicis

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1857Born
3 Jul 191962.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy
3 Jul 191962.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
25 Jul 191962.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
23 Jul 193780.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Maria de Amicis
Bishop Giacomo Maria de Amicis (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Genova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1919, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018