Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Natale Serafino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiavari, Italy

Titular Bishop of Tricca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1861Born
10 Apr 188625.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 191251.8AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
30 May 191352.3Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
22 Mar 191756.1AppointedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
4 Aug 191756.5ResignedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
4 Aug 191756.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricca
2 Sep 192463.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiavari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Natale Serafino
Bishop Natale Serafino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiavari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 28
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 2 Apr 2020

Quantcast