Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Alfonso Jorio (Iorio)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Nicomedia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1841Born
22 Sep 186625.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188038.8AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
7 Mar 188038.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
27 Mar 188543.9AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
15 Nov 190867.5ResignedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
15 Nov 190867.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
15 Nov 192180.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Alfonso Jorio (Iorio) (VIAF: 88622434)
Archbishop Pietro Alfonso Jorio (Iorio) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Angelo a Cancelli, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopS. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 333, and Page 536
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 271
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Mar 2017