Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Volpe

Deceased

Bishop of Alife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1824BornNapoli
8 Apr 184823.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 187651.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Venosa, Italy
3 Apr 187651.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
9 Apr 187651.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
15 Jul 187853.9SucceededBishop of Venosa, Italy
27 Feb 188055.5AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
13 Jul 188055.9InstalledBishop of Alife, Italy
9 Aug 188561.0DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Volpe:
Bishop Girolamo Volpe (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 90, and Page 539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 585
  • ob: CB, 29 May 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,747

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013