Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Sodo

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1862BornNapoli
21 Sep 188422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
2 Jun 191553.4AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
29 Jun 191553.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
24 Jul 193068.5DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Sodo:
Bishop Giovanni Sodo (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1915, Number 35
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013