Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Struffolini, D.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola

Titular Archbishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1853BornRoccarainola
15 Apr 190147.4AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
28 Apr 190147.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
1 Jul 191460.7ResignedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
1 Jul 191460.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
30 Mar 191763.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Struffolini: VIAF:89575960
Archbishop Angelo Struffolini D.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 Sep 2014