Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gesualdo Nicola Loschirico, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1823Born
19 Dec 184623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 May 187955.5AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
22 May 187955.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
27 Feb 188056.3AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
30 Mar 189066.4DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gesualdo Nicola Loschirico
Archbishop Gesualdo Nicola Loschirico O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCardinale, Diocese of Squillace
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 72, and Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017