Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William de Jesús Ruiz Velásquez

Prefect Emeritus of Leticia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1942 Born
11 Sep 196623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
8 Jul 199754.8AppointedPrefect of Leticia, Colombia
23 Oct 200058.1ResignedPrefect of Leticia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for William de Jesús Ruiz Velásquez:
Priest William de Jesús Ruiz Velásquez (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Leticia

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Leticia.

  • a priest for years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013