Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Adriano Díaz Melo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cali, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Celenderis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1872Born
1 Nov 189725.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 192754.5AppointedBishop of Cali, Colombia
16 Oct 192755.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cali, Colombia
13 Nov 194775.1RetiredBishop of Cali, Colombia
13 Nov 194775.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Celenderis
26 Feb 195582.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cali, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Adriano Díaz Melo
Bishop Luis Adriano Díaz Melo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cali

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontibón

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast