Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Heladio Posidio Perlaza Ramírez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cali

Titular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Paphlagonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1853BornCali
18 Sep 188027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Popayán, Colombia
11 Aug 191158.3AppointedBishop of Cali, Colombia
24 Aug 191259.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cali, Colombia
28 Sep 192673.4RetiredBishop of Cali, Colombia
28 Sep 192673.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Paphlagonia
10 Oct 193784.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cali, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Heladio Posidio Perlaza Ramírez:
Archbishop Heladio Posidio Perlaza Ramírez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cali

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 55
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013