Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Buenaventura Ortiz

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1840Born
15 Nov 187434.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188847.6AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
27 Dec 188848.2Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
15 Aug 189453.9DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Juan Buenaventura Ortiz
Bishop Juan Buenaventura Ortiz (born , died ) Bishop of Popayán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 19.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 463
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018