Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ulloa y Larios

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1819Born
19 Oct 188060.9AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
3 Apr 188161.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
17 Apr 188161.4InstalledBishop of Nicaragua
30 Jul 190282.7DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ulloa y Larios
Bishop Francisco Ulloa y Larios (born , died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelén
Ordained BishopCathedral, León, Diocese of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017