Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Bruschetti

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Abydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1826Born
23 Dec 184822.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 187650.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
8 Oct 187650.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
27 Oct 188155.7DiedTitular Bishop of Abydus

MicroData Summary for Luis Bruschetti
Bishop Luis Bruschetti (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Abydus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrada, Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
Ordained BishopRio de Janeiro, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017