Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Ignacio González Eyzaguirre

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1844BornSantiago
21 Sep 186723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
18 Apr 190762.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
17 Nov 190763.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
8 Aug 190864.0AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Nov 190864.3InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
9 Jun 191873.9DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Juan Ignacio González Eyzaguirre:
Archbishop Juan Ignacio González Eyzaguirre (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015