Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Claro Vásquez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Legio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1861Born
17 Mar 188827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
1 Jun 190847.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Legio
9 Aug 190847.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legio
21 May 192160.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
21 May 192160.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Miguel Claro Vásquez
Bishop Miguel Claro Vásquez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,908, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast