Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jorge Arturo Augustin Cardinal Medina Estévez

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Priest of San Saba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1926 BornSantiago
12 Jun 195427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
18 Dec 198458.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rancagua, Chile
18 Dec 198458.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibilis
6 Jan 198558.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibilis
25 Nov 198760.9AppointedBishop of Rancagua, Chile
16 Apr 199366.3AppointedBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
21 Jun 199669.5ResignedBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
21 Jun 199669.5AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
21 Feb 199871.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199871.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Saba
23 Feb 199871.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
24 May 199871.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Saba
1 Oct 200275.8RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
1 Mar 200881.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Saba

MicroData Summary for Jorge Arturo Augustin Medina Estévez:
Cardinal Jorge Arturo Augustin Medina Estévez (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2008
  • i: Bollettino, 19 May 1998

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013