Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Herrada Armijo, O. de M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Calama

Titular Bishop of Equizetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1922BornSan Pedro de Melipilla
18 Sep 194826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
26 Feb 197653.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Calama, Chile
5 Mar 198259.8AppointedPrelate of Calama, Chile
17 Apr 198259.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Calama, Chile
30 Nov 199169.5ResignedPrelate of Calama, Chile
30 Nov 199169.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antofagasta, Chile
30 Nov 199169.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Equizetum
16 Jul 199775.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Antofagasta, Chile
21 Jan 200279.7DiedPrelate Emeritus of Calama, Chile

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Herrada Armijo:
Bishop Juan Bautista Herrada Armijo O. de M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Calama

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013