Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Armentia Ugarte, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1845BornBernedo, Spain
13 Jun 186822.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
28 Apr 186923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Nov 190155.9AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
24 Feb 190256.2Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
24 Nov 190964.0DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Armentia Ugarte:
Bishop Nicolás Armentia Ugarte O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 434
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013