Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovani Edgar Arana

Auxiliary Bishop of El Alto, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Muteci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1974 Born
8 Dec 200430.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Paz, Bolivia
27 Mar 201843.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of El Alto, Bolivia
27 Mar 201843.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Muteci
25 Jul 201844.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muteci

MicroData Summary for Giovani Edgar Arana
Bishop Giovani Edgar Arana (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of El Alto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Paz, Archdiocese of La Paz
Ordained BishopVirgen de la Candelaira, Cathedral, El Alto, Diocese of El Alto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of El Alto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2018
  • ob: CB, 29 Jun 2018
  • c2: CB, 24 Jul 2018
  • c34: CB, 25 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast