Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmundo Luis Flavio Abastoflor Montero

Archbishop Emeritus of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1943 Born
10 Jun 196723.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 198440.8AppointedBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
13 Apr 198541.3Ordained BishopBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
31 Jul 199652.6AppointedArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
23 May 202076.4RetiredArchbishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Edmundo Luis Flavio Abastoflor Montero (VIAF: 5560377)
Archbishop Edmundo Luis Flavio Abastoflor Montero (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSucre

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of La Paz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • r: Bollettino, 23 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 23 May 2020

Quantcast