Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Vargas Aruquipa

Bishop of Coroico, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1947 Born
20 Jul 198033.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 199244.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Coroico, Bolivia
15 Jan 199244.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bita
25 Mar 199245.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bita
20 Aug 199750.4AppointedBishop of Coroico, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Juan Vargas Aruquipa
Bishop Juan Vargas Aruquipa (born ) Bishop of Coroico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAchacachi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Coroico.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,767

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast