Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Roberto Patricio Manning, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coroico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1922BornBaltimore, MD, USA
5 Jun 194825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Apr 195936.6AppointedPrelate of Coroico, Bolivia
21 Apr 195936.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsamosata
14 Jul 195936.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsamosata
30 Dec 197755.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Arsamosata
28 Jul 198360.9AppointedBishop of Coroico, Bolivia
9 Oct 199674.1ResignedBishop of Coroico, Bolivia
9 Nov 200179.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Coroico, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Tomás Roberto Patricio Manning:
Bishop Tomás Roberto Patricio Manning O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coroico

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 67
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013